Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/19/2021 at 08:32:49 (UTC).

LOPEZ, EDUARDO vs. NSHIMILIMANA, ORALIS

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 LOPEZ, EDUARDO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NSHIMILIMANA, ORALIS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0397

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ, EDUARDO

Defendants

NSHIMILIMANA, ORALIS

Houston, TX 77003

UWABALOLA, POLONARIA

Houston, TX 77003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLAZE, JORDAN A

 

Court Documents

Citation (Oralis Nshimilimana)

03/08/2021: Citation (Oralis Nshimilimana)

Citation (Polonaria Uwabalola)

03/08/2021: Citation (Polonaria Uwabalola)

Plaintiff's original petition and request for disclosure

02/23/2021: Plaintiff's original petition and request for disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UWABALOLA, POLONARIA; Issued: 2/24/2021; Served: 3/8/2021; Tracking: 73843859; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NSHIMILIMANA, ORALIS; Issued: 2/24/2021; Served: 3/8/2021; Tracking: 73843857; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GLAZE, JORDAN ANDREW; Person Filing: LOPEZ, EDUARDO;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glaze, Jordan Andrew