This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/21/2018 at 00:02:19 (UTC).

LOBO GYMNASTICS INC (D/B/A STONES GYM AN vs. TAYLOR, CASSANDRA

Case Summary

On 01/04/2016 LOBO GYMNASTICS INC D/B/A STONES GYM AN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against TAYLOR, CASSANDRA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL LANDRUM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0125

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL LANDRUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LOBO GYMNASTICS INC (D/B/A STONES GYM AND IDITAROD FITNESS)

2590 Falcon Pass

Houston, TX 77062

STONE'S GYM AND IDITAROD FITNESS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TAYLOR, CASSANDRA

Seabrook, TX 77586

KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS III LLC

KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS II LLC

Others

KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS III LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

2323 Clear Lake City Boulevard Suite 183

Houston, TX 77062

KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS II LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

2323 Clear Lake City Boulevard Suite 183

Houston, TX 77062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GREGG, CHRISTOPHER ANDERSON

GREGG, CHRISTOPHER A.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FIDDLER, G. SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

01/04/2016: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit 04

01/04/2016: Exhibit 04

Exhibit 03

01/04/2016: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 02

01/04/2016: Exhibit 02

Plaintiff, Lobo Gymnastics INC, D/B/A Stones Gym and Iditarod Fitness Original Petition Application for Temporary Restraining Order Application for Temporary Injunction Application for Permanent Injunction and Request for Expedited Discovery

01/04/2016: Plaintiff, Lobo Gymnastics INC, D/B/A Stones Gym and Iditarod Fitness Original Petition Application for Temporary Restraining Order Application for Temporary Injunction Application for Permanent Injunction and Request for Expedited Discovery

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF CASH DEPOSIT IN LIEU OF INJUNCTION BOND PER ORDER OF THE COURT

01/05/2016: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF CASH DEPOSIT IN LIEU OF INJUNCTION BOND PER ORDER OF THE COURT

Temporary Restraining Order (KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS III LLC MA)

01/06/2016: Temporary Restraining Order (KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS III LLC MA)

Temporary Restraining Order (KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS II LLC MAY)

01/06/2016: Temporary Restraining Order (KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS II LLC MAY)

Citation (KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS III LLC MA)

01/06/2016: Citation (KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS III LLC MA)

Citation (KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS II LLC MAY)

01/06/2016: Citation (KINEX FITNESS STUDIOS II LLC MAY)

Temporary Restraining Order(TAYLOR, CASSANDRA)

01/12/2016: Temporary Restraining Order(TAYLOR, CASSANDRA)

Citation( TAYLOR, CASSANDRA)

01/12/2016: Citation( TAYLOR, CASSANDRA)

Exhibit 03

01/14/2016: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 02

01/14/2016: Exhibit 02

Exhibit 01

01/14/2016: Exhibit 01

DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF CASSANDRA TAYLORS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

01/15/2016: DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF CASSANDRA TAYLORS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

02/12/2016: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

Proposed Order

02/12/2016: Proposed Order

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2016
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • Description: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; Order Signed: 2/12/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: FIDDLER, G. SCOTT; Person Filing: TAYLOR, CASSANDRA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 1/4/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 1/4/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GREGG, CHRISTOPHER A.; Person Filing: LOBO GYMNASTICS INC (D/B/A STONES GYM AND IDITAROD FITNESS);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GREGG, CHRISTOPHER A.; Person Filing: STONE'S GYM AND IDITAROD FITNESS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 1/4/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FIDDLER, G. SCOTT; Person Filing: TAYLOR, CASSANDRA;

    Read MoreRead Less