This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/14/2022 at 07:35:37 (UTC).

LINTON, KEVIN WAYNE vs. TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 LINTON, KEVIN WAYNE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2840

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINTON, KEVIN WAYNE

Defendants

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMUNITY JUSTICE ASSISTANCE DIVI

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY CENTRAL TECHNOLOGY SERVICES

Attn: Expunction Of Records,

Houston, TX 77002

HUMBLE POLICE DEPARTMENT

Attn: Expunction Of Records,

Humble, TX 77338

METRO POLICE METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

Attn: Expunction Of Records,

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL

HARRIS COUNTY TREASURER

Attn: Expunctions,

Houston, TX 77002

CITY OF HOUSTON LEGAL DEPARTMENT

Houston, TX 77001

Others

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie St 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Praire St Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Praire St Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAPPIA, JOHN ALEXANDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingCourt: 113; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CITY OF HOUSTON LEGAL DEPARTMENT; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73956836; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY TREASURER; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73956834; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: METRO POLICE METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73956831; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HUMBLE POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73956828; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CENTRAL TECHNOLOGY SERVICES; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73956827; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMUNITY JUSTICE ASSISTANCE DIVISI; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73956825; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73954668; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73954667; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73954665; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73954664; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73954663; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73954661; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73954660; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 12/28/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZAPPIA, JOHN ALEXANDER; Person Filing: LINTON, KEVIN WAYNE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE is a litigant