This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/08/2022 at 07:34:02 (UTC).

LIEM, EDWARD vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 LIEM, EDWARD filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8776

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIEM, EDWARD

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE

209 W. 14Th Street,

Austin, TX 78701

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY SHERRIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, AARON CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

SCOTT, MEAGAN THERESE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Results: Passed; Comments: PER EMAIL M.WHITE 10/06/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCOTT, MEAGAN THERESE; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74056885; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74052044; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74052043; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74052042; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74052041; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74052040; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 9/27/2022; Tracking: 74052039; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WHITE, AARON CHARLES; Person Filing: LIEM, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 9/14/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Parole Division is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant