This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/06/2022 at 07:44:36 (UTC).

LEWIS, SAVONNAH vs. WEBSTER, JACQUES B II (A/K/A TRAVIS SCOTT)

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 LEWIS, SAVONNAH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WEBSTER, JACQUES B II A/K/A TRAVIS SCOTT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1106

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEWIS, SAVONNAH

ADKINSON, VICTORIA G

ALLEN, DAYSHARA

ALMODOVAR, MICHAEL

D, L (MINOR)

COLLIER, RAYMOND

DEMPSEY, TIMOTHY (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND HIS MINOR CHILDREN

GARCIA, NATHAN

GILMORE, BEVERLY

GIRON, JULIAN

GUTIERREZ, ARED

HILBERT, TORIEAUNA

HUTCHINSON, MYRAKLE

JASSO, JOSE C

LEWIS, TYRIS

MCMILLAN, KIANA

MEJIA, JOHN

MOHER, MADDOX G

PEREZ, ALEJANDRA

Defendant

WEBSTER, JACQUES B II (A/K/A TRAVIS SCOTT)

58 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEBSTER, JASON CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Return of Service-Live Nation Worldwide Inc

12/27/2021: Return of Service-Live Nation Worldwide Inc

Return of Service-Scoremore Holdings LLC

12/27/2021: Return of Service-Scoremore Holdings LLC

Return of Service

12/27/2021: Return of Service

Return of Service

12/27/2021: Return of Service

Notice to The Court of Filing of Motion to Transfer Under Rule 13, Rules of Judicial Administration

12/29/2021: Notice to The Court of Filing of Motion to Transfer Under Rule 13, Rules of Judicial Administration

Return of Service

12/29/2021: Return of Service

Return of Service - CONTEMPORARY SERVICES CORPORATION

12/30/2021: Return of Service - CONTEMPORARY SERVICES CORPORATION

Service Returns - CACTUS JACK ENTERPRISES LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

12/30/2021: Service Returns - CACTUS JACK ENTERPRISES LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

Citation

12/30/2021: Citation

Service Return

01/03/2022: Service Return

Affidavit of Service

01/04/2022: Affidavit of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/13/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/13/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/13/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/13/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/13/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/13/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

12/13/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HICKS, TREY; Issued: 12/21/2021; Served: 12/29/2021; Tracking: 73952979; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GUTTFREUND, SASCHA S MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS COUNSEL; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73952977; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WEBSTER, JACQUES B II (A/K/A TRAVIS SCOTT) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 12/21/2021; Served: 12/29/2021; Received: 1/5/2022; Tracking: 73952976; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: APPLE INC (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 12/21/2021; Served: 12/28/2021; Tracking: 73952954; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FUSE TECHNICAL GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73952953; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EIGHTEENTWENTYSIX LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73952950; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AJ MELINO & ASSOCIATES INC (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73952947; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNIFIED COMMAND LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 12/21/2021; Tracking: 73952943; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEBSTER, JASON CHARLES; Person Filing: LEWIS, SAVONNAH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEBSTER, JASON CHARLES; Person Filing: GILMORE, BEVERLY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEBSTER, JASON CHARLES; Person Filing: MOHER, MADDOX G;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEBSTER, JASON CHARLES; Person Filing: PEREZ, ALEJANDRA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEBSTER, JASON CHARLES; Person Filing: SAM, TYARIEL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEBSTER, JASON CHARLES; Person Filing: MEJIA, JOHN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEBSTER, JASON CHARLES; Person Filing: JASSO, JOSE C;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEBSTER, JASON CHARLES; Person Filing: LEWIS, TYRIS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEBSTER, JASON CHARLES; Person Filing: MCMILLAN, KIANA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less