This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/09/2021 at 07:21:14 (UTC).

LEWIS, RONALD D (SR) vs. AMERICAN OIL COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 LEWIS, RONALD D SR filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN OIL COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5744

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEWIS, RONALD D (SR)

LEWIS, NORMA

Defendants and Others

AMERICAN OIL COMPANY

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

AXIALL CORPORATION

AXIALL LLC

BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC

BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC

CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC

CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP

CHEVRON USA HOLDINGS INC

CHEVRON U S A INC

CITGO PETROLEUM CORPORATION

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL INTERAMERICA INC

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

GULF OIL CORPORATION

INEOS US CHEMICALS COMPANY (INDIVIALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO BP AMOCO

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

MITSUI & CO (U S A) INC

SHELL CHEMICAL LP

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADLEY, TINA MARIE HAMILTON

Defendant Attorneys

BLIZZARD, JOSEPH

LANDRY, ANDRE M. III

 

Court Documents

Request for Issuance of Service

06/15/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Cover Letter

06/15/2021: Cover Letter

Plaintiffs Original Petition

06/15/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

DEFENDANTS AXIALL CORPORATION AND AXIALL LLCS JURY DEMAND

07/06/2021: DEFENDANTS AXIALL CORPORATION AND AXIALL LLCS JURY DEMAND

DEFENDANTS AXIALL CORPORATION AND AXIALL LLCS ORIGINAL ANSWER

07/06/2021: DEFENDANTS AXIALL CORPORATION AND AXIALL LLCS ORIGINAL ANSWER

American Oil Company, Atlantic Richfield Company, Bp Amoco Chemical Company N/K/A Ineos Us Chemicals Company, Bp Corporation North America Inc., And Bp Products North America Inc.S Original Answer

07/08/2021: American Oil Company, Atlantic Richfield Company, Bp Amoco Chemical Company N/K/A Ineos Us Chemicals Company, Bp Corporation North America Inc., And Bp Products North America Inc.S Original Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLIZZARD, JOSEPH; Person Filing: BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLIZZARD, JOSEPH; Person Filing: AMERICAN OIL COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLIZZARD, JOSEPH; Person Filing: INEOS US CHEMICALS COMPANY (INDIVIALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO BP AMOCO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLIZZARD, JOSEPH; Person Filing: ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLIZZARD, JOSEPH; Person Filing: BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LANDRY, ANDRE M. III; Person Filing: AXIALL CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LANDRY, ANDRE M. III; Person Filing: AXIALL LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE EXECUTED; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880984; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXACO INC (A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION) MAY BE EXECUTED WITH PROCESS; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880983; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880787; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC (A MARYLAND CORPORATION) MAY BE EXECUTED; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880783; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC (AN INDIANA CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880778; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AXIALL LLC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE EXECUTED WITH PROCESS; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880773; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AXIALL CORPORATION (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE EXECUTED WITH; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880762; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880759; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AMERICAN OIL COMPANY (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE EXECUTED WITH; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880755; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BRADLEY, TINA MARIE HAMILTON; Person Filing: LEWIS, NORMA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BRADLEY, TINA MARIE HAMILTON; Person Filing: LEWIS, RONALD D (SR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mitsui & Company USA is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN OIL COMPANY (FKA AMOCO OIL COMPANY AND AMOCO INC) is a litigant