This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:29:32 (UTC).

LEVERETT, BARBARA vs. LEVERETT, CLINTON SR

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 LEVERETT, BARBARA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LEVERETT, CLINTON SR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6340

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

LEVERETT, BARBARA

LEVERETT, CLINTON DAVID

LEVERETT, BARBARA DIANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HINCHMAN, GARY A.

CARRINGTON, DALE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2006
  • QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • MOTION DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER MOTION TO ENFORCE : Filing Attorney - ESSEX, MARIVONNE R. Person Filing - LEVERETT, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • ANSWER TO MOTION ENFORCEMENT : Filing Attorney - HINCHMAN, GARY A. Person Filing - LEVERETT, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2005
  • MOTION TO ENFORCE (FAMILY) : Filing Attorney - CARRINGTON, DALE Person Filing - LEVERETT, CLINTON SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2004
  • TEMPORARY ORD SIGNED WITHOUT CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2004
  • ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARRINGTON, DALE Person Filing - LEVERETT, CLINTON DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - CARRINGTON, DALE Person Filing - LEVERETT, CLINTON DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HINCHMAN, GARY A. Person Filing - LEVERETT, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less