This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:11:55 (UTC).

LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS LLC vs. REPIPE CONSTRUCTION LTD (AKA GARVER CONS

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against REPIPE CONSTRUCTION LTD AKA GARVER CONS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8483

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS LLC

REPIPE CONSTRUCTION LTD (AKA GARVER CONSTRUCTION LTD)

GARVER CONSTRUCTION LTD

NOBLE'S INSPECTION & LOCATOR'S INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BARRICK, JAMES STEPHEN

ROSSINI, MURRAY JOSEPH

DAVIS, JAMES PEIRCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2007
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2007
  • DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2007
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2007
  • MOTION FOR ORAL HEARING DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2007
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROSSINI, MURRAY JOSEPH Person Filing - REPIPE CONSTRUCTION LTD (AKA GARVER CONSTRUCTION LTD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2007
  • ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DAVIS, JAMES PEIRCE Person Filing - NOBLE'S INSPECTION & LOCATORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2005
  • ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • THIRD PARTY PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROSSINI, MURRAY JOSEPH Person Filing - REPIPE CONSTRUCTION LTD (AKA GARVER CONSTRUCTION LTD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • THIRD PARTY PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROSSINI, MURRAY JOSEPH Person Filing - GARVER CONSTRUCTION LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 3RD PARTY ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROSSINI, MURRAY JOSEPH Person Filing - REPIPE CONSTRUCTION LTD (AKA GARVER CONSTRUCTION LTD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROSSINI, MURRAY JOSEPH Person Filing - GARVER CONSTRUCTION LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BARRICK, JAMES STEPHEN Person Filing - LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less