This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/15/2022 at 07:28:35 (UTC).

LEONARD, BYRON vs. EOG RESOURCES INC

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 LEONARD, BYRON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EOG RESOURCES INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7198

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEONARD, BYRON

Defendants

EOG RESOURCES INC

RANGER ENERGY SERVICES LLC

A-1 ROCKET ENERGY SERVICES LLC

Others

EOG RESOURCES INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

RANGER ENERGY SERVICES LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED

Dallas, TX 75201

A-1 ROCKET ENERGY SERVICES LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

Amarillo, TX 79109

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIVLEY, WALTER PERRY JR.

Defendant Attorneys

MAGEE, MICHAEL WALTER

WOJCIECHOWSKI, MARC J.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/22/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Requests for Issuance of Service

03/22/2022: Requests for Issuance of Service

RULE 216 REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

04/12/2022: RULE 216 REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Defendant Eog Resources, Inc. Original Answer

04/12/2022: Defendant Eog Resources, Inc. Original Answer

Return of Service(A-1 Rocket Energy Services LLC)

04/07/2022: Return of Service(A-1 Rocket Energy Services LLC)

Return of Service-EOG RESOURCES INC

04/06/2022: Return of Service-EOG RESOURCES INC

A-1 ROCKET ENERGY SERVICES LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS PETITION

04/05/2022: A-1 ROCKET ENERGY SERVICES LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS PETITION

A-1 RICKET ENERGY SERVICES LLCS NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL

04/05/2022: A-1 RICKET ENERGY SERVICES LLCS NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR JURY TRIAL

Return Of Service(Eog Resources Inc)

04/01/2022: Return Of Service(Eog Resources Inc)

Return of Service(Ranger Energy Services LLC)

04/01/2022: Return of Service(Ranger Energy Services LLC)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MAGEE, MICHAEL WALTER; Person Filing: EOG RESOURCES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WOJCIECHOWSKI, MARC J.; Person Filing: A-1 ROCKET ENERGY SERVICES LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: A-1 ROCKET ENERGY SERVICES LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 3/24/2022; Served: 4/1/2022; Received: 4/6/2022; Tracking: 73987123; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RANGER ENERGY SERVICES LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 3/24/2022; Served: 3/30/2022; Tracking: 73987122; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EOG RESOURCES INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 3/24/2022; Served: 3/30/2022; Tracking: 73987121; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZIVLEY, WALTER PERRY JR.; Person Filing: LEONARD, BYRON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ranger Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EOG RESOURCES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wojciechowski, Marc J