This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/29/2016 at 22:38:58 (UTC).

LEMON, VALENCIA vs. KIRKSEY, SHARON

Case Summary

On 04/01/2016 LEMON, VALENCIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIRKSEY, SHARON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL LANDRUM. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0990

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL LANDRUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEMON, VALENCIA

Defendants

OWDLEY, BRUCUS (AN INDIVIDUAL DOING BUSINESS AS SOUTHERN COMFORT

Houston, TX 77074

KIRKSEY, SHARON

Houston, TX 77070

LAM, JIMMY

REALTY RIGHT TEXAS LLC

SOUTHERN COMFORT REALTY

TEXAS HOMEOWNER FINANCING ASSOCIATION

AUTRIE, JAMES (AN INDIVIDUAL DOING BUSINESS AS TEXAS HOMEOWNER

Sugar Land, TX 77498

Other

REALTY RIGHT TEXAS LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT IRMA CORONADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PELAK, JASON RYAN

Defendant Attorney

LOPEZ, BRIAN CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Information Sheet

04/01/2016: Civil Case Information Sheet

Original Petition & Request For Disclosure

04/01/2016: Original Petition & Request For Disclosure

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

04/05/2016: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

05/06/2016: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

Notice of Nonsuit

05/06/2016: Notice of Nonsuit

Defendants Kirksey's and Realty Right Texas' Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition, Jury Demand, and Request for Disclosure

05/09/2016: Defendants Kirksey's and Realty Right Texas' Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition, Jury Demand, and Request for Disclosure

Defendants Answer

05/12/2016: Defendants Answer

Trial Setting

05/27/2016: Trial Setting

Proposed Order

09/13/2016: Proposed Order

Exhibit B

09/13/2016: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

09/13/2016: Exhibit A

Defendants Sharon Kirksey's and Realty Right Texas LLC's Motion to Designate Responsible Third Parties

09/13/2016: Defendants Sharon Kirksey's and Realty Right Texas LLC's Motion to Designate Responsible Third Parties

Notice of Submission

09/28/2016: Notice of Submission

ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY

10/10/2016: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY

TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER

12/06/2016: TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER

Proposed Order Granting Defendants Agreed Motion for Continuance

12/16/2016: Proposed Order Granting Defendants Agreed Motion for Continuance

Defendants Sharon Kirksey's and Realty Right Texas, LLC's Agreed Motion for Continuance of Trial Setting

12/16/2016: Defendants Sharon Kirksey's and Realty Right Texas, LLC's Agreed Motion for Continuance of Trial Setting

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

12/21/2016: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 12/19/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY; Order Signed: 10/10/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATE EXPEDITED TRIAL READY GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Description: ANSWER; Person Filing: OWDLEY, BRUCUS (AN INDIVIDUAL DOING BUSINESS AS SOUTHERN COMFORT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LOPEZ, BRIAN CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: KIRKSEY, SHARON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LOPEZ, BRIAN CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: REALTY RIGHT TEXAS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/6/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PELAK, JASON RYAN; Person Filing: LEMON, VALENCIA;

    Read MoreRead Less