This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:07:58 (UTC).

LEE, BRENDA LEE vs. LEE, TIMOTHY ALLEN

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 LEE, BRENDA LEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LEE, TIMOTHY ALLEN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8062

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE, BRENDA LEE

Defendant

LEE, TIMOTHY ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALACHIAN-KRITZER, ELENA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2009
  • ORD SGND GRNTNG CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • WAIVER CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HALACHIAN-KRITZER, ELENA Person Filing - LEE, BRENDA LEE

    Read MoreRead Less