This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/12/2022 at 07:26:23 (UTC).

LEE, AMANDA vs. HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE OFFICE PCT. 8

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 LEE, AMANDA filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE OFFICE PCT 8. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8577

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE, AMANDA

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE OFFICE PCT. 8

CITY OF HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

BAYTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

BSU INVENTORY CONTROL - DISPOSITIONS

Others

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING RHONDA A REECE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBORDE, NICOLE WIGNALL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/09/2022

HearingCourt: 157; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BAYTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74074045; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE OFFICE PCT. 8; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74074044; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74074041; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067816; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067815; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067813; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067812; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067811; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067810; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING RHONDA A REECE; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067808; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2022

DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 10/20/2022;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DEBORDE, NICOLE WIGNALL; Person Filing: LEE, AMANDA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less