This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/21/2018 at 14:23:04 (UTC).

LASHLEY AND ASSOCIATES INC vs. ERVIN, RICHARD DEAN (DOING BUSINESS AS V

Case Summary

On 01/11/2016 LASHLEY AND ASSOCIATES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERVIN, RICHARD DEAN DOING BUSINESS AS V. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are ALEXANDRA SMOOTS-HOGAN and ALEXANDRA SMOOTS-THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1612

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

ALEXANDRA SMOOTS-HOGAN

ALEXANDRA SMOOTS-THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LASHLEY AND ASSOCIATES INC

Po Box 1601

Missouri City, TX 77459

Defendants

VENTILATION SERVICES INC

4930 Dacoma Suite K

Houston, TX 77092

ERVIN, RICHARD DEAN (DOING BUSINESS AS VENTILATION SERVICES INC)

Houston, TX 77095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MACKAY, ROBERT J

MACKAY, ROBERT J.

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, CANDICE CAMILLE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

01/11/2016: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

01/11/2016: CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

AFFIDAVIT

01/11/2016: AFFIDAVIT

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

01/11/2016: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation

01/22/2016: Citation

MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

02/19/2016: MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/19/2016: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES

02/19/2016: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

02/19/2016: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Defendant's Original Answer

02/26/2016: Defendant's Original Answer

Defendant's First Amended Original Answer

05/18/2016: Defendant's First Amended Original Answer

Exhibit -B

05/23/2016: Exhibit -B

Exhibit -A

05/23/2016: Exhibit -A

Plaintiff's first Supplemental Petition

05/23/2016: Plaintiff's first Supplemental Petition

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

08/11/2016: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Proposed Order Non-Suiting Case without Prejudice

04/18/2017: Proposed Order Non-Suiting Case without Prejudice

Certificate of Service

04/18/2017: Certificate of Service

ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

05/01/2017: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • Description: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Description: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/1/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Description: FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MACKAY, ROBERT J.; Person Filing: LASHLEY AND ASSOCIATES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMITH, CANDICE CAMILLE; Person Filing: ERVIN, RICHARD DEAN (DOING BUSINESS AS VENTILATION SERVICES INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMITH, CANDICE CAMILLE; Person Filing: VENTILATION SERVICES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMITH, CANDICE CAMILLE; Person Filing: ERVIN, RICHARD DEAN (DOING BUSINESS AS VENTILATION SERVICES INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MACKAY, ROBERT J.; Person Filing: LASHLEY AND ASSOCIATES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less