This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/12/2022 at 07:21:45 (UTC).

LANGRIDGE, JASON vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICTS CLERK OFFICE

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 LANGRIDGE, JASON filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICTS CLERK OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8492

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANGRIDGE, JASON

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICTS CLERK OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY HOUSTON

BAYTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDERON, CARLOS ANDRES VILLEJO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • HearingCourt: 055; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCE; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74074009; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BAYTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74074007; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067357; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067356; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067355; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067354; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067353; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74067352; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 10/20/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 10/20/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CALDERON, CARLOS ANDRES VILLEJO; Person Filing: LANGRIDGE, JASON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less