This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/07/2021 at 07:33:20 (UTC).

LANGLEY, CAMERON JAYMES vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY?S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 LANGLEY, CAMERON JAYMES filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7464

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANGLEY, CAMERON JAYMES

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY?S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERRIFF?S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK?S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK?S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PRECINCT 4

6831 Cypresswood Drive,

Spring, TX 77379

STATE OF TEXAS OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE

500 Jefferson St 6Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

201 Caroline St 2Nd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

201 Caroline St 3Rd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEDBETTER, LAKISHA SHANTEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingCourt: 080; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PRECINCT 4; Issued: 10/25/2021; Tracking: 73931127; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 10/25/2021; Tracking: 73927845; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 10/25/2021; Tracking: 73927844; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 10/25/2021; Tracking: 73927843; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 10/25/2021; Tracking: 73927839; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 10/25/2021; Tracking: 73927837; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 10/25/2021; Tracking: 73927835; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 10/15/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LEDBETTER, LAKISHA SHANTEL; Person Filing: LANGLEY, CAMERON JAYMES;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE is a litigant