This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/10/2022 at 07:33:27 (UTC).

LANEHART, TANYA vs. AVON PRODUCTS INC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 LANEHART, TANYA filed an Other lawsuit against AVON PRODUCTS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9350

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANEHART, TANYA

Defendants

AVON PRODUCTS INC

BARRETTS MINERALS INC

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC (FKA BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC FKA MINERAL

COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN

COLOR ME BEAUTIFUL INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

COTY INC

ESTEE LAUDER INC

H-E-B LP (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND FOR ITS HILL COUNTRY ESSENTIALS LINE

H E BUTT GROCERY COMPANY (ALSO DBA H-E-B LP)

IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-

PFIZER INC

PLAYTEX PRODUCTS LLC (FKA PLAYTEX PRODUCTS INC) (SUED INDIVIDUALLY

PRESPERSE CORPORATION (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA PRESPERSE

THE PROCTOR & GAMBLE COMPANY (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

SPECIALTY MINERALS INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A SUBSIDIARY OF

WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC

Other

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE

Defendant Attorneys

SPARDONE, STEPHANIE L.

FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO

BOND, BEVERLY MICHELLE

OGDEN, TODD DUANE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT SPECIALTY MINERALS INC.

09/19/2022: ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT SPECIALTY MINERALS INC.

ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

09/19/2022: ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

DEFENDANT PFIZER INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND, SUBJECT THERETO, ORIGINAL ANSWER, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND JURY DEMAND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE TO PLAINTIFF

09/19/2022: DEFENDANT PFIZER INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND, SUBJECT THERETO, ORIGINAL ANSWER, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND JURY DEMAND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE TO PLAINTIFF

Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

09/16/2022: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

Exhibit A

09/16/2022: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

09/16/2022: Exhibit B

AVON PRODUCTS, INC.S SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND SUBJECT THERETO, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS CLAIMS

09/16/2022: AVON PRODUCTS, INC.S SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND SUBJECT THERETO, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS CLAIMS

SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

10/06/2022: SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

DEFENDANT BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLCS SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

10/06/2022: DEFENDANT BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLCS SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

Answer of Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Jury Demand

10/04/2022: Answer of Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Jury Demand

Certificate of Written Discovery

10/04/2022: Certificate of Written Discovery

DEFENDANT COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANYS SPECIAL APPEARANCE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS

09/21/2022: DEFENDANT COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANYS SPECIAL APPEARANCE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS

DEFENDANT COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANYS (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-ININTEREST TO THE MENNEN COMPANY) SPECIAL APPEARANCE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS

09/21/2022: DEFENDANT COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANYS (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-ININTEREST TO THE MENNEN COMPANY) SPECIAL APPEARANCE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS-CL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OGDEN, TODD DUANE; Person Filing: WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOND, BEVERLY MICHELLE; Person Filing: COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: BARRETTS MINERALS INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: PFIZER INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: SPECIALTY MINERALS INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A SUBSIDIARY OF;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE; Person Filing: LANEHART, TANYA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SPARDONE, STEPHANIE L.; Person Filing: AVON PRODUCTS INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: REFERRED TO PRE-TRIAL COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECIALTY MINERALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AVON PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where H.E. Butt Grocery Company is a litigant