This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:46:21 (UTC).

LAKE FOREST OF KELLIWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSO vs. BANAY, ERLINDA

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 LAKE FOREST OF KELLIWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BANAY, ERLINDA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1268

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKE FOREST OF KELLIWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATON INC

Defendant

BANAY, ERLINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESSOCK, JEFFREY J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2006
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2006
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2006
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2006
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2006
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2006
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MESSOCK, JEFFREY J. Person Filing - LAKE FOREST OF KELLIWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATON INC

    Read MoreRead Less