This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:22:46 (UTC).

LABRADA BODYBUILDING NUTRITION INC vs. NATURE'S BEST INC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 LABRADA BODYBUILDING NUTRITION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NATURE'S BEST INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0690

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LABRADA BODYBUILDING NUTRITION INC

Defendants

NATURE'S BEST INC

NATURE'S BEST (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NATURE'S BEST INC) (CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUNISTERI, JAMES G.

Defendant Attorney

WACHENDORFER, EDWARD R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2006
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WACHENDORFER, EDWARD R. Person Filing - NATURE'S BEST (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NATURE'S BEST INC) (CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MUNISTERI, JAMES G. Person Filing - LABRADA BODYBUILDING NUTRITION INC

    Read MoreRead Less