Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/25/2021 at 07:48:41 (UTC).

KUMELSKI, GABRIELLA vs. ALVAREZ, RAYSA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 KUMELSKI, GABRIELLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALVAREZ, RAYSA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1764

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUMELSKI, GABRIELLA

Defendants

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC

ALVAREZ, RAYSA

City, TX 75088

Other

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLAZE, JORDAN A

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's original petition and request for disclosure

03/01/2021: Plaintiff's original petition and request for disclosure

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0782 8084

03/02/2021: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0782 8084

Certified Mail Receipt

03/03/2021: Certified Mail Receipt

Citation

03/16/2021: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALVAREZ, RAYSA; Issued: 3/2/2021; Served: 3/12/2021; Received: 3/16/2021; Tracking: 73845471; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 3/2/2021; Tracking: 73845469; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GLAZE, JORDAN ANDREW; Person Filing: KUMELSKI, GABRIELLA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glaze, Jordan Andrew