This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/18/2022 at 02:04:58 (UTC).

KUEHN, MARILYNDA vs. BARRETTS MINERALS INC

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 KUEHN, MARILYNDA filed an Other lawsuit against BARRETTS MINERALS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0174

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KUEHN, MARILYNDA

FLANAGAN, RICHARD

NORRIS, MANDY

FLANAGAN, JOSHUA

Defendants

BARRETTS MINERALS INC

BLOCK DRUG CO INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

BLOCK CORP (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC (F/K/A BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC F/K/A

CHATTEM INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE

COTY INC

HIMMEL MANAGEMENT CO LLC (A/K/A HIMMEL GROUP FORMERLY D/B/A MARTIN

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO

PFIZER INC

PTI UNION LLC (A/K/A PHARMA TECH INDUSTRIES)

R T VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

SPECIALTY MINERALS INC ( SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A

UNION CARBIDE CORP

VANDERBILT MINERALS LLC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO R T

WHITTAICER CLARK & DANIELS INC

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

Defendant Attorneys

FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO

WILKES, FORREST REN

SUDDLESON, TODD J.

Other Attorneys

ELLISTON, GARY D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

01/03/2022: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

Exhibit A

01/03/2022: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

01/03/2022: Exhibit B

DEFENDANT, COTY INC.S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL AND FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

02/08/2022: DEFENDANT, COTY INC.S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL AND FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

DEFENDANT VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLCS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS AND ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION SUBJECT TO ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

01/31/2022: DEFENDANT VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLCS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS AND ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION SUBJECT TO ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

DEFENDANT R.T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS AND ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION SUBJECT TO ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

01/31/2022: DEFENDANT R.T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS AND ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION SUBJECT TO ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Verification

01/25/2022: Verification

Defendant Chattem, INC'S Verified Original Answer To Plaintiff's First Amended Petition-Cross-Claims and Answer To All Cross Claims

01/24/2022: Defendant Chattem, INC'S Verified Original Answer To Plaintiff's First Amended Petition-Cross-Claims and Answer To All Cross Claims

ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT SPECIALTY MINERALS INC.

01/10/2022: ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT SPECIALTY MINERALS INC.

ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

01/10/2022: ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue and, Subject Thereto, Original Answer, Special Exceptions, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure to Plaintiffs

01/10/2022: Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue and, Subject Thereto, Original Answer, Special Exceptions, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure to Plaintiffs

Defendant Block Drug Company, Inc.'s Special Appearance

03/09/2022: Defendant Block Drug Company, Inc.'s Special Appearance

Defendant Block Drug Corporation's Special Appearance

03/09/2022: Defendant Block Drug Corporation's Special Appearance

SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF PTI UNION, LLC PURSUANT TO RULE 120a

03/02/2022: SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF PTI UNION, LLC PURSUANT TO RULE 120a

LETTER

03/02/2022: LETTER

DEFENDANT BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC.S SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

02/23/2022: DEFENDANT BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC.S SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

DEFENDANT BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLCS SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

02/23/2022: DEFENDANT BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLCS SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILKES, FORREST REN; Person Filing: COTY INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SUDDLESON, TODD J.; Person Filing: VANDERBILT MINERALS LLC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO R T;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: CHATTEM, INC., A SUBSIDIARY OF SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: BARRETTS MINERALS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: PFIZER INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: SPECIALTY MINERALS INC ( SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATHEN, FRANK J. II; Person Filing: FLANAGAN, RICHARD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATHEN, FRANK J. II; Person Filing: KUEHN, MARILYNDA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATHEN, FRANK J. II; Person Filing: NORRIS, MANDY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATHEN, FRANK J. II; Person Filing: FLANAGAN, JOSHUA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECIALTY MINERALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Block and Company Inc is a litigant