This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:10:32 (UTC).

KRAMER, JOSEPH A III vs. TOWNSEND, JAMIE ELAINE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 KRAMER, JOSEPH A III filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TOWNSEND, JAMIE ELAINE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0398

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRAMER, JOSEPH A III

Defendant

TOWNSEND, JAMIE ELAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DADINIS, PETER H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DADINIS, PETER H. Person Filing - KRAMER, JOSEPH A III

    Read MoreRead Less