This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:17:02 (UTC).

KOCH, JOHN TYLER vs. CHOYCE, PATRICK D

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 KOCH, JOHN TYLER filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against CHOYCE, PATRICK D. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1342

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOCH, JOHN TYLER

Defendant

CHOYCE, PATRICK D

Katy, TX 77494

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RANEY, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Affidavit

06/01/2020: Affidavit

Officer/Authorized Person Return

06/01/2020: Officer/Authorized Person Return

Proposed Order

06/03/2020: Proposed Order

Exhibit 6

06/03/2020: Exhibit 6

Exhibit 5

06/03/2020: Exhibit 5

Exhibit 4

06/03/2020: Exhibit 4

Exhibit 3

06/03/2020: Exhibit 3

Exhibit 2

06/03/2020: Exhibit 2

Exhibit 1

06/03/2020: Exhibit 1

Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Pursuant To Texas Rule of Civil Procedure 91A

06/03/2020: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Pursuant To Texas Rule of Civil Procedure 91A

Defendant's Original Answer

06/03/2020: Defendant's Original Answer

Notice of Hearing(06.24.20)

06/05/2020: Notice of Hearing(06.24.20)

Notice of Hearing(DISM 06.30.20)

06/05/2020: Notice of Hearing(DISM 06.30.20)

Proposed Order

06/05/2020: Proposed Order

Notice of Submission(06.15.20) - PRO SE

06/05/2020: Notice of Submission(06.15.20) - PRO SE

Defendant's Special Exceptions

06/05/2020: Defendant's Special Exceptions

PDC Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: PDC Request for Issuance of Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: Dismissal; Requesting Party: RANEY, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS (TRCP 91); Requesting Party: RANEY, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RANEY, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL; Person Filing: CHOYCE, PATRICK D;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHOYCE, PATRICK D; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/30/2020; Tracking: 73753181; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: KOCH, JOHN TYLER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less