This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 16:59:10 (UTC).

KLEINMAN, KENNETH vs. ARKEMA INC (F/K/A PENNWALT CORPORATION AND ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 KLEINMAN, KENNETH filed an Other lawsuit against ARKEMA INC F/K/A PENNWALT CORPORATION AND ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8588

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KLEINMAN, KENNETH

ROPPOLO, MARIAN

Defendants

ARKEMA INC (F/K/A PENNWALT CORPORATION AND ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA

PENNWALT CORPORATION

ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA INC

AVENTIS INC

BARRETTS MINERALS INC

BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC (F/K/A BAYER CONSUMER CARE

BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC

MSD CONSUMER CARE INC

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC (F/K/A BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC F/K/A

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC

MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS INC

COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY

COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC

CROWN LABORATORIES INC

DR SCHOLL'S LLC (A/K/A BAYER SAMSON II LLC)

BAYER SAMSON II LLC

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL, AUSTIN COLYER

Other Attorneys

WILKES, FORREST REN

MILLER, MATTHEW ROSS

ELLISTON, GARY D.

SIMEK, DOUGLAS RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Brenntag North America, Inc.'s Notice of Oral Hearing

04/14/2022: Brenntag North America, Inc.'s Notice of Oral Hearing

Brenntag Specialties, LLC's Notice of Oral Hearing

04/14/2022: Brenntag Specialties, LLC's Notice of Oral Hearing

Notice Of Hearing

04/21/2022: Notice Of Hearing

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING NOTICE TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC.

05/03/2022: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING NOTICE TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC.

ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC.S NOTICE TO SUBSTITUTE LEAD COUNSEL

05/03/2022: ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC.S NOTICE TO SUBSTITUTE LEAD COUNSEL

FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

05/12/2022: FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

05/13/2022: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

DEFENDANT PLAYTEX MARKETING CORPORATIONS ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

02/22/2022: DEFENDANT PLAYTEX MARKETING CORPORATIONS ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

DEFENDANT BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLCS SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

02/23/2022: DEFENDANT BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLCS SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

02/23/2022: SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Companys (As A Successor-In Interest To The Mennen Company) Special Exceptions, Answer To Plaintiffs First Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, And Answer To All Cross-Claims

02/24/2022: Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Companys (As A Successor-In Interest To The Mennen Company) Special Exceptions, Answer To Plaintiffs First Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, And Answer To All Cross-Claims

Defendant GSK Consumer Health , Inc.'s Special Appearance

03/07/2022: Defendant GSK Consumer Health , Inc.'s Special Appearance

Defendant Glaxosmithkline, LLC's Incorrectly Sued as "Glaxosmithkline LLC f/k/a SmithKlne Beecham Co

03/07/2022: Defendant Glaxosmithkline, LLC's Incorrectly Sued as "Glaxosmithkline LLC f/k/a SmithKlne Beecham Co

Defendant Crown Laboratories, Inc.'s Special Appearance

03/07/2022: Defendant Crown Laboratories, Inc.'s Special Appearance

Defendant Crown Laboratories, Inc.'s Special Appearance

03/07/2022: Defendant Crown Laboratories, Inc.'s Special Appearance

Defendant GSK Consumer Health, Inc.'s Special Appearance

03/07/2022: Defendant GSK Consumer Health, Inc.'s Special Appearance

Defendant GSK Consumer Health, Inc.'s Amended Special Appearance

03/08/2022: Defendant GSK Consumer Health, Inc.'s Amended Special Appearance

Defendant Glaxosmithkline LLC's Incorrectly Sued as "Glaxosmithkline LLC f/k/a Smithkline Beecham Corp. and Smithkline Beecham P.L.C. (Sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Yarkley of London a/k/a Yardley) for its Yardley Line of Products

03/08/2022: Defendant Glaxosmithkline LLC's Incorrectly Sued as "Glaxosmithkline LLC f/k/a Smithkline Beecham Corp. and Smithkline Beecham P.L.C. (Sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Yarkley of London a/k/a Yardley) for its Yardley Line of Products" Spe

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: PLEA TO JURISDICTION (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 120A); Requesting Party: KURNATH, CAITLIN MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: SPECIAL APPEARANCE (MOTION FOR)(TRCP 120A); Requesting Party: OGDEN, TODD DUANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: SPECIAL APPEARANCE (MOTION FOR)(TRCP 120A); Requesting Party: OGDEN, TODD DUANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: SPECIAL APPEARANCE (MOTION FOR)(TRCP 120A); Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: OGDEN, TODD DUANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: SPECIAL APPEARANCE (MOTION FOR)(TRCP 120A); Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: OGDEN, TODD DUANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: PLEA TO JURISDICTION (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 120A); Results: Passed; Comments: WILL RESET; Requesting Party: IRVIN, JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD; Order Signed: 5/13/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: MILLER, MATTHEW ROSS; Person Filing: PLAYTEX PRODUCTS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: MILLER, MATTHEW ROSS; Person Filing: L'OREAL USA INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: MILLER, MATTHEW ROSS; Person Filing: PLAYTEX PRODUCTS LLC (F/K/A PLAYTEX PRODUCTS INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DANIEL, AUSTIN COLYER; Person Filing: COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: PLAYTEX MARKETING CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATHEN, FRANK J. II; Person Filing: KLEINMAN, KENNETH;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATHEN, FRANK J. II; Person Filing: ROPPOLO, MARIAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DR. SCHOLL'S LLC a/k/a BAYER SAMSON II LLC; is a litigant

Latest cases where BARRETTS MINERALS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MSD Consumer Care Inc. is a litigant