This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:02:36 (UTC).

KLEIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. ROYAL UNIFORMS

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 KLEIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ROYAL UNIFORMS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7754

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

KLEIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

NORTH HARRIS MONTGOMERY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY RURAL FIRE PREVENTION DISTRICT NO 16

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT NO 11

SPRING CREEK FOREST PUBLIC UTILITY DISTRICT

ROYAL UNIFORMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WISEMAN, TERRY G.

NIMS, ANTHONY W.

TOWNSEND, SCOTT RICHETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2005
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2005
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - TOWNSEND, SCOTT RICHETT Person Filing - SPRING CREEK FOREST PUBLIC UTILITY DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • DEFAULT RECOMMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • STENO RECORD MADE (TAX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - NIMS, ANTHONY W. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY RURAL FIRE PREVENTION DISTRICT NO 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - NIMS, ANTHONY W. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - NIMS, ANTHONY W. Person Filing - NORTH HARRIS MONTGOMERY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - NIMS, ANTHONY W. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - NIMS, ANTHONY W. Person Filing - PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - NIMS, ANTHONY W. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT NO 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - NIMS, ANTHONY W. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - NIMS, ANTHONY W. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WISEMAN, TERRY G. Person Filing - KLEIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less