This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/18/2020 at 03:26:06 (UTC).

KLEIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. GRAYMEIREN HOLDINGS LLC (IN REM ONLY)

Case Summary

On 05/21/2015 KLEIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GRAYMEIREN HOLDINGS LLC IN REM ONLY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9505

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KLEIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

ALIEF INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

ALIEF INDEPENDANT SCHOOL DISTRICT

EMERAL FOREST UTILITY DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

Intervenor Defendants and Defendants

GRAYMEIREN HOLDINGS LLC (IN REM ONLY)

TIME WARNER CABLE MEDIA INC (IN REM ONLY)

UNIVISION RADIO INC (IN REM ONLY)

INLAND AMERICAN RETAIL MANAGEMENT LLC (IN REM ONLY)

CA NEW PLAN FIXED RATE PARTNERSHIP LP (IN REM ONLY)

BRIXMOR GA APOLLO 1 TX LP (IN REM ONLY)

BRE RETAIL RESIDUAL OWNER 1 LLC (IN REM ONLY)

NNN HARRISON CROSSING LP (IN REM ONLY)

AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL (RELATED SERVIES COMPANY INC) (IN REM ONLY)

CLARK, CORY

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (IN REM ONLY)

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT 9

Others

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (IN REM ONLY) TO

1000 Louisiana Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002

CLARK, CORY (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF STATE OF

Prospect, KY 40059

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIEHLE, ELIZABETH ANN

1235 North Loop

Houston, TX 77008

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

LINEBARGER, GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

Defendant Attorneys

ELLISON, MARC LANCE

2211 Norfolk #5

Houston, TX 77098

LINDLEY, J. ROBIN

2229 San Felipe

Houston, TX 77019

METTENBRINK, ERIC CRAIG

1415 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

CROSS, NANCY A. BURNS

919 Milam Suit

Houston, TX 77002

Other Attorneys

YOUNG, COURTNEY L

10000 Memorial D

Houston, TX 77024

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

P.O. Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

 

Court Documents

Notice of Activity

Notice of Activity

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

05/21/2015: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

05/21/2015: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

05/21/2015: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

05/21/2015: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

05/21/2015: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

05/21/2015: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

05/21/2015: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

05/21/2015: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

05/21/2015: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

06/08/2015: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Alias Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

06/17/2015: Alias Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Constable's Return

07/02/2015: Constable's Return

Officer's Return

07/02/2015: Officer's Return

Officer's Return

07/02/2015: Officer's Return

Constable's Return

07/02/2015: Constable's Return

Constable's Return

07/02/2015: Constable's Return

Constable's Return

07/02/2015: Constable's Return

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED; Order Signed: 9/23/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORD SIGNED SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 2/12/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketType of Service: ORDER OF SALE (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: EXECUTION ORDER OF SALE; Person: GRAYMEIREN HOLDINGS LLC (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 5/22/2019; Served: 8/6/2019; Returned: 8/12/2019; Tracking: 73627830; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • HearingCourt: 133; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Tried

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY); Order Signed: 4/12/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SGND GRANTING SALE OF PROPERTY; Order Signed: 4/12/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 4/12/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GRAYMEIREN HOLDINGS LLC (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS CHIEF EXECUTIVE; Issued: 6/19/2015; Tracking: 73142055; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NNN HARRISON CROSSING LP (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 5/27/2015; Served: 6/15/2015; Tracking: 73134422; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BRE RETAIL RESIDUAL OWNER 1 LLC (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 5/27/2015; Tracking: 73134420; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CA NEW PLAN FIXED RATE PARTNERSHIP LP (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 5/27/2015; Tracking: 73134419; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: INLAND AMERICAN RETAIL MANAGEMENT LLC (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 5/27/2015; Tracking: 73134417; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNIVISION RADIO INC (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT C T; Issued: 5/27/2015; Tracking: 73134416; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TIME WARNER CABLE MEDIA INC (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 5/27/2015; Tracking: 73134414; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GRAYMEIREN HOLDINGS LLC (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS CHIEF EXECUTIVE; Issued: 5/27/2015; Tracking: 73134413; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BRIXMOR GA APOLLO 1 TX LP (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 5/27/2015; Served: 8/14/2018; Received: 9/18/2018; Tracking: 73134412; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WIEHLE, ELIZABETH ANN; Person Filing: KLEIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HISPANIC BROADCASTING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TIME WARNER CABLE MEDIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Greymeiren Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INLAND AMERICAN RETAIL MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant