Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:50:49 (UTC).

KISER, PRESTON vs. RIAZ, ASIF

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 KISER, PRESTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RIAZ, ASIF. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9591

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KISER, PRESTON

Defendants

RIAZ, ASIF

Houston, TX 77095

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY BY SERVING

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYLHART, ALEX

Defendant Attorneys

COYER, GREGORY EUGENE

SPRUNG, STACEY A.

 

Court Documents

Original Answer

04/20/2020: Original Answer

Defendant's Original Answer

04/23/2020: Defendant's Original Answer

Certifcate of Written Discovery

04/23/2020: Certifcate of Written Discovery

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

05/20/2020: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Certificate of Written Discovery

05/22/2020: Certificate of Written Discovery

Return of Service

04/03/2020: Return of Service

Request for Issuance of Service- Progressive

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service- Progressive

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit 03

03/26/2020: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 02

03/26/2020: Exhibit 02

Exhibit 01

03/26/2020: Exhibit 01

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Discovery Requests

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Discovery Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingCourt: 190; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SPRUNG, STACEY A.; Person Filing: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: COYER, GREGORY EUGENE; Person Filing: RIAZ, ASIF;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY BY SERVING; Issued: 3/30/2020; Served: 4/3/2020; Tracking: 73738793; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIAZ, ASIF; Issued: 3/30/2020; Tracking: 73738795; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOYLHART, ALEX; Person Filing: KISER, PRESTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYLHART, ALEX PACER