This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/09/2021 at 14:43:21 (UTC).

KINGSBERRY, KENNETH JOHN (JR) vs. PLAINS PIPELINE L P

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 KINGSBERRY, KENNETH JOHN JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PLAINS PIPELINE L P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0516

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINGSBERRY, KENNETH JOHN (JR)

Defendants

PLAINS PIPELINE L P

PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE L P

GUERRERO, ISRAEL VALERIO

Odessa, TX 79761

Others

PLAINS PIPELINE L P MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE L P MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNTER, TODD

HUNTER, TODD AMES JR.

Defendant Attorney

FOJTIK, KIMBERLY A

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition, Jury Demand, Request for Initial Disclosures, and Notice of Intent to use Produced Documents

07/06/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition, Jury Demand, Request for Initial Disclosures, and Notice of Intent to use Produced Documents

Request for Issuance of Service

07/06/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

07/06/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

07/06/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Notice of Nearing (8.19.21)

07/29/2021: Notice of Nearing (8.19.21)

Defendants Plains Pipeline, L.P., All American Pipeline, L.P., and Israel Valerio Guerro's Motion to Tranfer Venue and Subject Therto, Original Answer, Other Defenses and Jury Demand

07/27/2021: Defendants Plains Pipeline, L.P., All American Pipeline, L.P., and Israel Valerio Guerro's Motion to Tranfer Venue and Subject Therto, Original Answer, Other Defenses and Jury Demand

Exhibit A

07/27/2021: Exhibit A

Service Return- Israel Guerrero

07/12/2021: Service Return- Israel Guerrero

Affidavit of Service-Plains Pipeline LP

07/12/2021: Affidavit of Service-Plains Pipeline LP

Affidavit of Service-PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE L P

07/12/2021: Affidavit of Service-PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE L P

Proposed Joint Stipulated Confidentiality Order

08/26/2021: Proposed Joint Stipulated Confidentiality Order

Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to Winkler County

08/17/2021: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to Winkler County

Exhibit A

08/17/2021: Exhibit A

Proposed Order Denying Defendants Motion To Transfer Venue

08/17/2021: Proposed Order Denying Defendants Motion To Transfer Venue

Amended Notice of Hearing(09.17.21)

08/11/2021: Amended Notice of Hearing(09.17.21)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: TRANSFER-COMPLETE (MOTION TO); Requesting Party: FOJTIK, KIMBERLY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: TRANSFER CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT (MOTION TO); Results: Passed; Comments: PER EMAIL S.MOBERG 12:39PM 08/3/21; Requesting Party: FOJTIK, KIMBERLY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOJTIK, KIMBERLY A; Person Filing: PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOJTIK, KIMBERLY A; Person Filing: GUERRERO, ISRAEL VALERIO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOJTIK, KIMBERLY A; Person Filing: PLAINS PIPELINE L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GUERRERO, ISRAEL VALERIO; Issued: 7/7/2021; Served: 7/8/2021; Received: 7/12/2021; Tracking: 73887997; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE L P MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 7/7/2021; Served: 7/8/2021; Received: 7/12/2021; Tracking: 73887995; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PLAINS PIPELINE L P MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 7/7/2021; Served: 7/8/2021; Received: 7/12/2021; Tracking: 73887991; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HUNTER, TODD AMES JR.; Person Filing: KINGSBERRY, KENNETH JOHN (JR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plains All American Pipeline L.P. is a litigant