This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:14:22 (UTC).

KIM, SONG IL vs. CORDER, JOHN MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 KIM, SONG IL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CORDER, JOHN MICHAEL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0649

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM, SONG IL

Defendants

CORDER, JOHN MICHAEL

CORDER, MARY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONAS, AARON

Defendant Attorney

HARRELL, C. ED JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2007
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2007
  • FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2007
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JONAS, AARON Person Filing - KIM, SONG IL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2007
  • TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2006
  • ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION IN PART SEE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HARRELL, C. ED JR. Person Filing - CORDER, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HARRELL, C. ED JR. Person Filing - CORDER, JOHN MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2005
  • TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HARRELL, C. ED JR. Person Filing - CORDER, JOHN MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HARRELL, C. ED JR. Person Filing - CORDER, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JONAS, AARON Person Filing - KIM, SONG IL

    Read MoreRead Less