This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:19:09 (UTC).

KIEL, KENNETH WADE vs. QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 KIEL, KENNETH WADE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against QUIGLEY COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0678

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREWS, WILLIS JR

BARCLAY, ARTHUR LOUIS SR

GABRIEL, HOSEA EPPS JR

LARSON, ANDREW RICHARD

PEOPLES, LYNN WAYNE

MORA, GERALD JOSEPH

NEAL, CLAUDETTE HENRY

RICHARD, WILTON

SOLOMON, THOMPSON SR

KIEL, KENNETH WADE

KIEL, BETTY J (PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF KENNETH WADE

Defendants

QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD

AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY (FKA PAN AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION)

PAN AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION

AMERICAN OIL COMPANY (FKA AMOCO OIL COMPANY)

AMOCO INC

AMM LUMUS GLOBAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY

AMETEK INC

93 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MADDOX, MARILYN NIX

KALE, JEFFERY TODD

Defendant Attorneys

POWERS, JAMES H.

BREM, MICHAEL LAMAR

CALDERON, RAUL M.

Other Attorneys

LEVINE, TORI SMITH

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

STEVENS, RAYMOND LYN

TAYLOR, THOMAS W

BLAZEK, PAULA H

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

GARDNER, STEPHEN SHAYNE

ADAMS, KENT M.

CLARK, SANDRA FRENCH

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

SCHREIBER, JOSEPH MICHAEL

TIDWELL, JOHN L.

WADE, TODD N.

BENNETT, KAREN

7 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2015
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2007
  • SUGGESTION OF DEATH : Filing Attorney - KALE, JEFFERY TODD Person Filing - KIEL, BETTY J (PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF KENNETH WADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2005
  • ANSWER SEVENTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2005
  • SEVENTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DIXON, DAVID ALLEN Person Filing - KIEL, KENNETH WADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - LARSON, ANDREW RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - GABRIEL, HOSEA EPPS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - MORA, GERALD JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - PEOPLES, LYNN WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - BARCLAY, ARTHUR LOUIS SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - NEAL, CLAUDETTE HENRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - RICHARD, WILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - KIEL, KENNETH WADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - ANDREWS, WILLIS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - SOLOMON, THOMPSON SR

    Read MoreRead Less