This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:07:09 (UTC).

KHAN, WASIM MOHAMMAD vs. KHAN, DIANE MARIE

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 KHAN, WASIM MOHAMMAD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KHAN, DIANE MARIE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8048

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHAN, WASIM MOHAMMAD

Defendant

KHAN, DIANE MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASNER, KATHLEEN ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2005
  • ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GASNER, KATHLEEN ANN Person Filing - KHAN, WASIM MOHAMMAD

    Read MoreRead Less