This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:27:48 (UTC).

KENNETH D EICHNER PC vs. BAKER, RANDALL CRAIG

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 KENNETH D EICHNER PC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BAKER, RANDALL CRAIG. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1557

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNETH D EICHNER PC

Defendants

AAXY LLC

GUPTA, RAVI

Friendswood, TX 77546

GUPTA, PRAVEENA

Friendswood, TX 77546

BAKER, RANDALL CRAIG

Houston, TX 77024

Other

AAXY LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

13284 Pond Springs Road Suite 405

Austin, TX 78729

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAHN, HOWARD

KAHN, HOWARD M.

Defendant Attorney

MCDANIEL, TIMOTHY M.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service - AAXY LLC

06/09/2020: Affidavit of Service - AAXY LLC

Citation - GUPTA, PRAVEENA

06/10/2020: Citation - GUPTA, PRAVEENA

Citation - GUPTA, RAVI

06/10/2020: Citation - GUPTA, RAVI

Ravi Gupta and Praveena Gupta's Original Answer and Request for Disclosures

06/15/2020: Ravi Gupta and Praveena Gupta's Original Answer and Request for Disclosures

Exhibit A

06/15/2020: Exhibit A

AAXY, LLC's Original Answer and Request for Disclosures

06/15/2020: AAXY, LLC's Original Answer and Request for Disclosures

Request for Issuance of Service

06/15/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Ravi Gupta's and Praveena Gupta's Original Crossclaim

06/15/2020: Ravi Gupta's and Praveena Gupta's Original Crossclaim

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

05/26/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

Exhibit A

05/26/2020: Exhibit A

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS

05/26/2020: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDANIEL, TIMOTHY M.; Person Filing: GUPTA, RAVI;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDANIEL, TIMOTHY M.; Person Filing: AAXY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDANIEL, TIMOTHY M.; Person Filing: GUPTA, PRAVEENA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AAXY LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/29/2020; Received: 6/9/2020; Tracking: 73753154; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GUPTA, PRAVEENA; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 6/3/2020; Received: 6/10/2020; Tracking: 73753152; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GUPTA, RAVI; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 6/3/2020; Received: 6/10/2020; Tracking: 73753150; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BAKER, RANDALL CRAIG; Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73753137; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KAHN, HOWARD M.; Person Filing: KENNETH D EICHNER PC;

    Read MoreRead Less