This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:34:11 (UTC).

KELVER, SANDRA ROSE vs. KELVER, WILLIAM RICHARD

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 KELVER, SANDRA ROSE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KELVER, WILLIAM RICHARD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6378

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELVER, SANDRA ROSE

Defendant

KELVER, WILLIAM RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENOS, GREG BLANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2005
  • QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING ENTRY OF NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2004
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ENOS, GREG BLANE Person Filing - KELVER, SANDRA ROSE

    Read MoreRead Less