This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/10/2015 at 12:34:15 (UTC).

KELLEY, VALERIE (IND AND AS PERSONAL REP vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 09/06/2005 KELLEY, VALERIE IND AND AS PERSONAL REP filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7385

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

KELLEY, VALERIE (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY

ELLIOTT COMPANY

A W CHESTERTON

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA D B RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER CORP)

D B RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORP

BUFFALO PUMPS INC

CERTAINTEED CORP

CRANE COMPANY

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC (SUCCESSOR TO MUNDET CORK COMPANY)

DANA CORP

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

81 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

REAGIN, HILARY GLASSMAN

RHODES, KENNETH D.

ROACH, CRYSTAL

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

WADE, TODD N.

JACKSON, JESSICA S.

WHITE, CLAY M.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

POWERS, JAMES H.

BLAZEK, PAULA H

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY

Other Attorneys

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

QUINN, CHRISTI D.

FULLER, L. HAYES III

FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD

FRASE, LAURA ANN

IRVIN, JASON JAMES

GOMEZ, ALEXIS J.

25 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2013
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PRAZAK, JONATHAN R Person Filing - IMO INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - REAGIN, HILARY GLASSMAN Person Filing - KELLEY, VALERIE (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KINSEL, J. FRANK JR. Person Filing - HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2007
  • SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLARY, BRIAN S. Person Filing - RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - REYNARD, DAVID D. JR. Person Filing - RPM INC (SUCCESSOR TO REPUBLIC POWDERED METALS SUCCESSOR TO BONDEX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLARY, BRIAN S. Person Filing - RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BAKER, PAMELA J. Person Filing - A W CHESTERTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE Person Filing - CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC (SUCCESSOR TO MUNDET CORK COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - REYNARD, DAVID D. JR. Person Filing - BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLACK, LOU THOMPSON Person Filing - KELLEY, VALERIE (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

    Read MoreRead Less