This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:04:02 (UTC).

KELLEY, JOHNNY LEE vs. KELLEY, VANESSA LYNETTE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 KELLEY, JOHNNY LEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KELLEY, VANESSA LYNETTE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0359

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELLEY, JOHNNY LEE

Defendant

KELLEY, VANESSA LYNETTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • PAUPER'S OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less