This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/24/2023 at 03:34:52 (UTC).

KAUR, KHUSHPREET vs. PADRON, ISIDRO

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 KAUR, KHUSHPREET filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PADRON, ISIDRO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1299

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAUR, KHUSHPREET

Defendants

PADRON, ISIDRO

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY BY SERVING ITS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VONG, JOHN HUNG

Defendant Attorneys

YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.

MEYNIER, MAURICE JOSEPH IV

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

08/18/2022: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Return of Service

08/25/2022: Return of Service

Defendant's Original Answer

09/16/2022: Defendant's Original Answer

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

09/29/2022: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Return of Service

10/11/2022: Return of Service

Affidavit

10/14/2022: Affidavit

Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel

10/14/2022: Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel

Certificate of Written Discovery

10/19/2022: Certificate of Written Discovery

Plaintiffs Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant Progressive County Mutual Insurance

10/20/2022: Plaintiffs Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant Progressive County Mutual Insurance

Defendants Original Answer

11/02/2022: Defendants Original Answer

Certificate of Written Discovery

11/14/2022: Certificate of Written Discovery

Rule 11 Settlement Agreement

12/27/2022: Rule 11 Settlement Agreement

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER

12/29/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER

Defendant Progressive County Mutual Insurance Companys Designation of Lead Counsel

01/06/2023: Defendant Progressive County Mutual Insurance Companys Designation of Lead Counsel

DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

03/31/2023: DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2023

HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR); Results: Case Settled; Comments: PER R-11 AGREEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR); Results: Passed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023

DocketDescription: DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Order Signed: 3/31/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023

DocketDescription: PLAINTIFF COSTS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023

HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (MOTION TO) (TRCP 165A); Results: Dismissed For Want of Prosecution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: PADRON, ISIDRO;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2022

DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2022

DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 9/29/2022;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022

DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SNODGRASS, THERESA C; Person Filing: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022

DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022

DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022

DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022

DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 8/22/2022; Served: 8/25/2022; Tracking: 74042154; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022

DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PADRON, ISIDRO; Issued: 8/22/2022; Served: 10/8/2022; Received: 10/12/2022; Tracking: 74041657; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NGO, CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: KAUR, KHUSHPREET;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022

DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022

DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less