This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/01/2021 at 07:32:29 (UTC).

KAAN CAFE' INC vs. ELITE VS CAPITAL INVESTMENT INC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 KAAN CAFE' INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELITE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are RABEEA COLLIER and C. ELLIOTT THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7244

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

RABEEA COLLIER

C. ELLIOTT THORNTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

KAAN CAFE' INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ELITE VS CAPITAL INVESTMENT INC

ALAHMED, ABDULLAH

ALAHMED, MOHAMMED

Houston, TX 77057

Other

ELITE VS CAPITAL INVESTMENT INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING

6430 Richmond Avenue Suite 325

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'DONNELL, THOMAS JOSEPH

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request

09/09/2021: Civil Process Request

Civil Process Request

09/09/2021: Civil Process Request

Plaintiffs Original Verified Petition and Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

09/07/2021: Plaintiffs Original Verified Petition and Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

Exhibit A

09/07/2021: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

09/07/2021: Exhibit B

Exhibit C

09/07/2021: Exhibit C

Exhibit D

09/07/2021: Exhibit D

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Temporary Restraining Order & Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Injunction

09/07/2021: Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Temporary Restraining Order & Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Injunction

Request for Issuance of Service

09/07/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

09/07/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

09/13/2021: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

Defendant Original Answer and Counterclaim

09/13/2021: Defendant Original Answer and Counterclaim

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN; Person Filing: ALAHMED, ABDULLAH;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN; Person Filing: ELITE VS CAPITAL INVESTMENT INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN; Person Filing: ALAHMED, ABDULLAH;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN; Person Filing: ALAHMED, MOHAMMED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN; Person Filing: ALAHMED, MOHAMMED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED; Order Signed: 9/13/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN; Person Filing: ELITE VS CAPITAL INVESTMENT INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Ancillary Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (MOTION FOR); Results: Denied; Comments: (REVIEW DOCKET ENTRY); Requesting Party: O'DONNELL, THOMAS JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER DENIED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALAHMED, MOHAMMED; Issued: 9/9/2021; Tracking: 73913955; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ELITE VS CAPITAL INVESTMENT INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING; Issued: 9/9/2021; Tracking: 73913954; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: O'DONNELL, THOMAS JOSEPH; Person Filing: KAAN CAFE' INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kaan Cafe Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ELITE VS CAPITAL INVESTMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OVERSTREET, JAMES NATHAN