This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:37:18 (UTC).

JUNCTION PIPELINE COMPANY LLC vs. PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE L P

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 JUNCTION PIPELINE COMPANY LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE L P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4239

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUNCTION PIPELINE COMPANY LLC

Defendants

PLAINS MARKETING CANADA L P

CHS INC (D/B/A CENEX HARVEST INC)

CENEX HARVEST INC

PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE L P

CENEX PIPELINE LLC

PMC (NOVA SCOTIA) COMPANY

Others

ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE L P BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION

PLAINS MARKETING CANADA L P BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS SECRETARY

CHS INC (DBA CENEX HARVEST INC) (A MINNESOTA NONPROFIT CORPORATION)

CENEX PIPLINE LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION SERVICE

PMC (NOVA SCOTIA) COMPANY BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT OR ITS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZABEL, THOMAS A.

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt / Receipt

08/24/2018: Certified Mail Receipt / Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

08/16/2018: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

08/16/2018: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

08/16/2018: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

08/16/2018: Certified Mail Receipt

Letter to Clerk for Certified Fees

08/15/2018: Letter to Clerk for Certified Fees

Civil Case Information Sheet

08/15/2018: Civil Case Information Sheet

Letter to Clerk

08/15/2018: Letter to Clerk

Certified mail tracking number 7017 1450 0001 3700 8280

08/15/2018: Certified mail tracking number 7017 1450 0001 3700 8280

Certified mail tracking number 7017 1450 0001 3700 8273

08/15/2018: Certified mail tracking number 7017 1450 0001 3700 8273

Certified mail tracking number 7017 1450 0001 3700 8266

08/15/2018: Certified mail tracking number 7017 1450 0001 3700 8266

Certified mail tracking number 7017 1450 0001 3700 8259

08/15/2018: Certified mail tracking number 7017 1450 0001 3700 8259

Certified mail tracking number 7017 1450 0001 3700 8242

08/15/2018: Certified mail tracking number 7017 1450 0001 3700 8242

Junction Pipeline LLC's Original Petition

08/13/2018: Junction Pipeline LLC's Original Petition

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZABEL, THOMAS A.; Person Filing: JUNCTION PIPELINE COMPANY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMC (Nova Scotia) Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Plains All American Pipeline L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.H.G. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZABEL, THOMAS A