This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:21:13 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N A (FKA JPMORGAN CH vs. YOUNT, STEVE G (DBA CREATIVE MORTGAGE)

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N A FKA JPMORGAN CH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YOUNT, STEVE G DBA CREATIVE MORTGAGE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0681

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N A (FKA JPMORGAN CHASE BANK FKA THE CHASE

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

CHASE MANHATTAN BANK

Defendants

YOUNT, STEVE G (DBA CREATIVE MORTGAGE)

CREATIVE MORTGAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCANELLY, ELAINE M. S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCANELLY, ELAINE M. S. Person Filing - CHASE MANHATTAN BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCANELLY, ELAINE M. S. Person Filing - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCANELLY, ELAINE M. S. Person Filing - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N A (FKA JPMORGAN CHASE BANK FKA THE CHASE

    Read MoreRead Less