This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 05:51:35 (UTC).

JONES, SUZETTE C vs. ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 JONES, SUZETTE C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2657

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES, SUZETTE C

JONES, RANDALL

Defendants

ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

KENNEDY, MARK

Houston, TX 77042

Other

ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED WITH

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOELLNER, ANDREW AMBERG

Defendant Attorney

BLUM, KIMBERLY NINH

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

01/14/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

01/14/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

01/14/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Notice to State Court of Removal

03/16/2022: Notice to State Court of Removal

EXHIBIT 1

03/16/2022: EXHIBIT 1

PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION

03/07/2022: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION

DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

03/02/2022: DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

Defendant's Election of Legal Responsibility

02/24/2022: Defendant's Election of Legal Responsibility

Notice of Hearing by Submission on Defendant's Notice of Election of Legal Responsibility for Mark Kennedy

02/24/2022: Notice of Hearing by Submission on Defendant's Notice of Election of Legal Responsibility for Mark Kennedy

Proposed Order

02/24/2022: Proposed Order

Defendants Original Answer

02/16/2022: Defendants Original Answer

Citation

01/26/2022: Citation

Citation

01/26/2022: Citation

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • HearingCourt: 125; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: DISMISS (MOTION TO); Results: Granted; Requesting Party: BLUM, KIMBERLY NINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION; Order Signed: 3/7/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLUM, KIMBERLY NINH; Person Filing: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLUM, KIMBERLY NINH; Person Filing: KENNEDY, MARK;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLUM, KIMBERLY NINH; Person Filing: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLUM, KIMBERLY NINH; Person Filing: KENNEDY, MARK;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KENNEDY, MARK; Issued: 1/19/2022; Served: 1/26/2022; Tracking: 73961330; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED WITH; Issued: 1/19/2022; Served: 1/26/2022; Tracking: 73961327; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WOELLNER, ANDREW AMBERG; Person Filing: JONES, SUZETTE C;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WOELLNER, ANDREW AMBERG; Person Filing: JONES, RANDALL;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blum, Kimberly