This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/18/2021 at 04:03:15 (UTC).

JONES, MICHAEL A. vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 JONES, MICHAEL A filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8618

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES, MICHAEL A.

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

OCA EXPUNCTIONS - LEGAL DIVISION

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT 4

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

OCA EXPUNCTIONS LEGAL DIVISION SERVICING MARGIE JOHNSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 9/16/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: JONES, MICHAEL A.;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT 4 is a litigant

Latest cases where OCA EXPUNCTIONS- LEGAL DIVISIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant