This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/28/2019 at 07:35:47 (UTC).

JONES, DUANE CHRIS vs. WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 JONES, DUANE CHRIS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK N A. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8853

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES, DUANE CHRIS

Houston, TX 77095

JONES, TIFFANY RENE

Houston, TX 77095

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

3476 Stateview Blvd

Fort Mill, SC 29715

MERS

1901 E. Voorhees St. Suite C

Danville, IL 61834

SWBC MORTGAGE CORP

9311 San Pedro

San Antonio, TX 78216

 

Court Documents

Questions

02/12/2019: Questions

Plaintiff's Notice of Current Address

02/12/2019: Plaintiff's Notice of Current Address

Exhibit R5

02/12/2019: Exhibit R5

Exhibit R2

02/12/2019: Exhibit R2

Affidavit

02/12/2019: Affidavit

Affidavit of Walker F. Todd, Expert Witness for Defendants

02/12/2019: Affidavit of Walker F. Todd, Expert Witness for Defendants

Defendant's Notice of Removal

02/14/2019: Defendant's Notice of Removal

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Injunction

02/04/2019: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Injunction

Exhibit 03

02/04/2019: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 02

02/04/2019: Exhibit 02

Exhibit 01

02/04/2019: Exhibit 01

Civil Case Information Sheet

02/04/2019: Civil Case Information Sheet

Affidavit of Tiffany Rene Jones

02/04/2019: Affidavit of Tiffany Rene Jones

Affidavit of Duane Chris Jones

02/04/2019: Affidavit of Duane Chris Jones

Plaintiffs Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order Fraud by Non Disclosure Fraudulent Inducement Recoupment Injunctive Relief Declatory Judgment Quiet Title and Request for Disclosure

02/04/2019: Plaintiffs Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order Fraud by Non Disclosure Fraudulent Inducement Recoupment Injunctive Relief Declatory Judgment Quiet Title and Request for Disclosure

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

02/05/2019: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Temporary Restraining Order & Setting Hearing for Temporary Injunction

02/05/2019: Temporary Restraining Order & Setting Hearing for Temporary Injunction

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

02/05/2019: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • Description: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/5/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 2/5/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 2/5/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: JONES, TIFFANY RENE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: JONES, DUANE CHRIS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: JONES, DUANE CHRIS;

    Read MoreRead Less