This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:06:19 (UTC).

JOHNSON, MARILYN Y vs. JOHNSON, BROUNWICK R

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 JOHNSON, MARILYN Y filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOHNSON, BROUNWICK R. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8037

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, MARILYN Y

Defendant

JOHNSON, BROUNWICK R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER RETURNED-INSUFF IENT/INACCURATE ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less