This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/25/2022 at 07:27:39 (UTC).

JOHNSON, JONATHAN vs. JB HUNT TRANSPORT INC

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 JOHNSON, JONATHAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JB HUNT TRANSPORT INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1797

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNSON, JONATHAN

ARDOIN, ANGELA

Defendants

JB HUNT TRANSPORT INC

DOE, JOHN

Other

JB HUNT TRANSPORT INC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) BY SERVING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER KELLEY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

11/01/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Return of Service (JB Hunt Transport Inc.)

11/04/2022: Return of Service (JB Hunt Transport Inc.)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JB HUNT TRANSPORT INC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) BY SERVING; Issued: 11/2/2022; Served: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74072404; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER KELLEY; Person Filing: ARDOIN, ANGELA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER KELLEY; Person Filing: JOHNSON, JONATHAN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less