This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:22:22 (UTC).

JOHNSON, DWAYNE (JR) vs. AUSTIN, BERTHA

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 JOHNSON, DWAYNE JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUSTIN, BERTHA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9826

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, DWAYNE (JR)

Defendant

AUSTIN, BERTHA

Houston, TX 77021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VU, VINCENT T.

VU, VINCENT THANH

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition and Demand for Rule 194 Disclosure(s)

12/08/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition and Demand for Rule 194 Disclosure(s)

Civil Process Request

12/08/2021: Civil Process Request

Citation- BERTHA AUSTIN

12/17/2021: Citation- BERTHA AUSTIN

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AUSTIN, BERTHA; Issued: 12/9/2021; Served: 12/16/2021; Tracking: 73950221; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: VU, VINCENT THANH; Person Filing: JOHNSON, DWAYNE (JR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VU, VINCENT T.