This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/18/2018 at 18:24:20 (UTC).

JOHNSON, DANNY vs. KROGER TEXAS LP

Case Summary

On 02/18/2016 JOHNSON, DANNY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KROGER TEXAS LP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLENEL McFARLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0210

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLENEL McFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, DANNY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KROGER TEXAS LP

UNIVERSAL SHEET METAL INC

SKYE-HILSHIRE L P

Defendants and Cross Defendants

UNIVERSAL SHEET METAL INC

SKYE-HILSHIRE L P

Others

KROGER TEXAS LP (AN OHIO CORPORATION) BY SERVING THROUGH ITS

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

SKYE-HILSHIRE L P (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

UNIVERSAL SHEET METAL INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLITSAS, LOREN GEORGE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

AKERS, BROCK C.

MCTAGGART, DAVID JAMES

GLOCKSIEN, VINCENT

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

GLOCKSIEN, VINCENT

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

02/18/2016: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Defendants Application and Demand for Trial by Jury

03/23/2016: Defendants Application and Demand for Trial by Jury

Civil Process Request

04/13/2016: Civil Process Request

Defendant's First Amended Original Answer

04/14/2016: Defendant's First Amended Original Answer

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

04/21/2016: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Defendant , Skye-Hilshire, L.P.'s Original Answer and Requests for Disclosure, First Set Of Interrogatories and First Request For Production

05/20/2016: Defendant , Skye-Hilshire, L.P.'s Original Answer and Requests for Disclosure, First Set Of Interrogatories and First Request For Production

Civil Process Request Form

06/23/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Defendant, Skye-Hilshire, L.P.'s Answer to Kroger Texas L.P.'s Cross Action

07/13/2016: Defendant, Skye-Hilshire, L.P.'s Answer to Kroger Texas L.P.'s Cross Action

Certification

07/25/2016: Certification

Certification

08/22/2016: Certification

Certification

08/23/2016: Certification

Certification

09/14/2016: Certification

Cross Action

09/21/2016: Cross Action

Defendants Designation of Expert Witnesses

12/02/2016: Defendants Designation of Expert Witnesses

Defendant Universal Sheet Metal Inc's Expert Designation

12/05/2016: Defendant Universal Sheet Metal Inc's Expert Designation

Reporters Certification Deposition of Danny Johnson Taken December 6, 2016

01/09/2017: Reporters Certification Deposition of Danny Johnson Taken December 6, 2016

Agreed Motion for Continuance

01/12/2017: Agreed Motion for Continuance

Officer Certification Pursuant to Texas Rule of Civil Procedure 203

03/21/2017: Officer Certification Pursuant to Texas Rule of Civil Procedure 203

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Description: AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/2/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Description: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 1/23/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Description: CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCTAGGART, DAVID JAMES; Person Filing: UNIVERSAL SHEET METAL INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Description: ANSWER CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: GLOCKSIEN, VINCENT; Person Filing: SKYE-HILSHIRE L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CAPPS, JARED WILLIE; Person Filing: JOHNSON, DANNY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Description: CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GLOCKSIEN, VINCENT; Person Filing: SKYE-HILSHIRE L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/21/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KLITSAS, LOREN GEORGE; Person Filing: JOHNSON, DANNY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KLITSAS, LOREN GEORGE; Person Filing: JOHNSON, DANNY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.