This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:16:50 (UTC).

JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER vs. THE METHODIST HOSPITAL (D/B/A HOUSTON METHODIST - TEXAS MEDICAL

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE METHODIST HOSPITAL D/B/A HOUSTON METHODIST - TEXAS MEDICAL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1337

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER

Others and Defendants

THE METHODIST HOSPITAL (D/B/A HOUSTON METHODIST - TEXAS MEDICAL

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

HOUSTON METHODIST - TEXAS MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEALE, JASON KYLE

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

06/11/2020: Affidavit of Service

Civil Process Request

05/26/2020: Civil Process Request

Plaintiff's Original Petition & Request for Disclosure

05/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition & Request for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THE METHODIST HOSPITAL (D/B/A HOUSTON METHODIST - TEXAS MEDICAL; Issued: 5/26/2020; Served: 6/4/2020; Tracking: 73752598; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BEALE, JASON KYLE; Person Filing: JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER;

    Read MoreRead Less