This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/24/2021 at 07:56:21 (UTC).

JOHNSON, CHARLINE vs. TIMEWISE FOOD STORE #3901

Case Summary

On 11/10/2015 JOHNSON, CHARLINE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TIMEWISE FOOD STORE 3901. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7351

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, CHARLINE

Defendants

TIMEWISE FOOD STORE #3901

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES EXCHANGE PROPERTIES LLC

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES EXCHANGE PROPERTIES INC

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUERA, SOFIA E.

3100 Timmons La

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorney

DODGE, DAVID WILSON

14801 Quorum Dri

Dallas, TX 75254

Other Attorneys

BRUERA, SOFIA

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request Form

11/10/2015: Civil Process Request Form

Civil Case Information Sheet

11/10/2015: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiffs Original Petition

11/10/2015: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

11/12/2015: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Service Return

11/23/2015: Service Return

Service Return

11/23/2015: Service Return

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

12/29/2015: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

Filing Letter

02/04/2016: Filing Letter

Proposed Agreed Arbitration Order

02/04/2016: Proposed Agreed Arbitration Order

Notice of Filing Rule 11 Agreement

02/04/2016: Notice of Filing Rule 11 Agreement

Notice of Appearance

02/04/2016: Notice of Appearance

ORDER GRANTING ARBITRATION SIGNED

02/19/2016: ORDER GRANTING ARBITRATION SIGNED

DCA Generic Letter

03/16/2018: DCA Generic Letter

Johnson status letter to the Court

04/20/2018: Johnson status letter to the Court

DCA Generic Letter

10/22/2019: DCA Generic Letter

Proposed Order of Nonsuit With Prejudice

10/28/2019: Proposed Order of Nonsuit With Prejudice

Notice of Nonsuit With Prejudice

10/28/2019: Notice of Nonsuit With Prejudice

ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

10/30/2019: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • HearingCourt: 190; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed; Comments: CASE DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/30/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • HearingCourt: 190; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed; Comments: STATUS REPORT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • HearingCourt: 190; Docket Type: Another Docket; Reason: COORDINATORS REMINDER; Results: Passed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED STAYING PROCEEDINGS; Order Signed: 2/19/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketDescription: CASE ABATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/19/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING ARBITRATION SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/19/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BRUERA, SOFIA E.; Person Filing: JOHNSON, CHARLINE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 11/12/2015; Served: 11/18/2015; Returned: 11/21/2015; Tracking: 73187123; Deliver To: CIV AGCY-CIVILIAN SERVICE AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 11/12/2015; Served: 11/18/2015; Returned: 11/21/2015; Received: 11/21/2015; Tracking: 73187121; Deliver To: CIV AGCY-CIVILIAN SERVICE AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BRUERA, SOFIA E.; Person Filing: JOHNSON, CHARLINE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where TIMEWISE FOOD STORES #208 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sofia E. Bruera