This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/04/2018 at 20:15:48 (UTC).

JENKINS, THOMAS vs. ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 JENKINS, THOMAS filed an Other lawsuit against ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9988

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENKINS, THOMAS

Defendants

GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY

GOODRICH CORPORATION (F K A B F GOODRICH COMPANY)

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC

AMETEK INC (SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HAVEG INDUSTRIES)

CARBORUMDUM

A W CHESTERTON COMPANY

NATKIN SERVICE CO

CAPCO PIPE COMPANY INC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

RAPID-AMERICA CORPORATION

VIACOM INC

GREENE TWEED & CO INC

DANA CORPORATION

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORP

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES L L C

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, EDWARD STUART

Defendant Attorney

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

2615 Calder Ave

Beaumont, TX 77702

 

Court Documents

Notice of Activity

09/14/2018: Notice of Activity

ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

09/12/2018: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

Notice of activity

09/12/2018: Notice of activity

ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

09/07/2018: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

AGREED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

09/06/2018: AGREED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

09/06/2018: ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

09/04/2018: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

Exhibit A

09/04/2018: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

09/04/2018: Exhibit B

Filing letter

09/04/2018: Filing letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD; Order Signed: 9/12/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD; Order Signed: 9/7/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMITH, EDWARD STUART; Person Filing: JENKINS, THOMAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARBORUMDUM CO INC THE is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPCO PIPE COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL REFRACTORIES CO is a litigant

Latest cases where GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC is a litigant