This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/15/2022 at 07:26:22 (UTC).

JEFFERY, MATTHEW XAVIER vs. OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 JEFFERY, MATTHEW XAVIER filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6285

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERY, MATTHEW XAVIER

Defendants

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE ??? CJAD

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERRIF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KEVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING RHONDA A REECE

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION (OCA EXPUNCTIONS) BY SERVING

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • HearingCourt: 215; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 12/9/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: JEFFERY, MATTHEW XAVIER;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less