This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 16:03:05 (UTC).

JEFFERSON SMITH L L C vs. JETALL COMPANIES INC

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 JEFFERSON SMITH L L C filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JETALL COMPANIES INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9591

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

JEFFERSON SMITH L L C

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

JETALL COMPANIES INC

CHOUDHRI, ALI

Houston, TX 77027

QUINLAN, JOHN

Other

JETALL COMPANIES INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant

QUINLAN, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

MAHENDRU, ASHISH

639 Heights Bo

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY, LLOYD E.

2726 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

 

Court Documents

Jetall Companies INC. And Ali Choudhri's Response To Plaintiff's Motion For Contempt And Motion For Sanction And Show Cause

02/20/2019: Jetall Companies INC. And Ali Choudhri's Response To Plaintiff's Motion For Contempt And Motion For Sanction And Show Cause

Proposed Show Cause Order

02/11/2019: Proposed Show Cause Order

Exhibit A

02/11/2019: Exhibit A

Jefferson Smith's Reply and Supplement in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Jettal's counterclaims Pursuant to Tex Tax Code 171.252 and Plea to the Jurisdiction

02/06/2019: Jefferson Smith's Reply and Supplement in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Jettal's counterclaims Pursuant to Tex Tax Code 171.252 and Plea to the Jurisdiction

Exhibit B

02/01/2019: Exhibit B

Exhibit C

01/18/2019: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

01/18/2019: Exhibit B

Defendant's Objection And Motion To Quash And Motion For Protection As To Subpoena To Glen Bell

01/18/2019: Defendant's Objection And Motion To Quash And Motion For Protection As To Subpoena To Glen Bell

Exhibit A

01/10/2019: Exhibit A

Defendants' Motion To Quash The Notice of Deposition of Ali Choudhri

12/26/2018: Defendants' Motion To Quash The Notice of Deposition of Ali Choudhri

Exhibit A

11/30/2018: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Response To Defendants' Motion For Confidentiality Order

11/30/2018: Plaintiff's Response To Defendants' Motion For Confidentiality Order

Exhibit B

11/09/2018: Exhibit B

ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION

11/15/2018: ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION

Ex. A--Defendants' Objections and Answers to Plaintiff's First ROGs

11/15/2018: Ex. A--Defendants' Objections and Answers to Plaintiff's First ROGs

Notice of Telephone Hearing on Defendants' Discovery Objections

11/15/2018: Notice of Telephone Hearing on Defendants' Discovery Objections

Proposed Order Denying Temporary Restraining Order

10/01/2018: Proposed Order Denying Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit C

10/10/2018: Exhibit C

111 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 2/18/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT; Order Signed: 2/7/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION; Order Signed: 1/24/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 12/10/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Description: PROTECTIVE ORDER (CIVIL) ORD SGND; Order Signed: 12/6/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING CONFIDENTIALITY; Order Signed: 12/6/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Description: ORD SGNED GRANTING OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGS IN PART SEE ORD; Order Signed: 12/6/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Description: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: MAHENDRU, ASHISH; Person Filing: JEFFERSON SMITH L L C;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Description: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: MAHENDRU, ASHISH; Person Filing: QUINLAN, JOHN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION; Order Signed: 11/15/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 10/1/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: KELLEY, LLOYD E.; Person Filing: CHOUDHRI, ALI;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MAHENDRU, ASHISH; Person Filing: JEFFERSON SMITH L L C;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: THIRD PARTY PETITION; Filing Attorney: KELLEY, LLOYD E.; Person Filing: JETALL COMPANIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: KELLEY, LLOYD E.; Person Filing: JETALL COMPANIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: THIRD PARTY PETITION; Filing Attorney: KELLEY, LLOYD E.; Person Filing: CHOUDHRI, ALI;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: KELLEY, LLOYD E.; Person Filing: JETALL COMPANIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: KELLEY, LLOYD E.; Person Filing: CHOUDHRI, ALI;

    Read MoreRead Less